Arti bhatnagar additional secretary
http://www.stclimited.co.in/content/board-directors Web5 gen 2024 · Shri Kapil Kumar Gupta, Director - Finance (MMTC) with additional charge Director - Finance (STC) - Chairperson. Dr. Rohini Sanjay Kachole, Independent Director …
Arti bhatnagar additional secretary
Did you know?
Web25 apr 2024 · Additional Secretary/ Additional Secretary Equivalent : Sunil Shreekrishna Dadhe (IA&AS:1988) Subir Mallick (IA&AS:1989) Anand Mohan Bajaj (IA&AS:1990) Ms .Arti Bhatnagar (IDAS:1990) Vishvajit Sahay (IDAS:1990) Anil Kumar Nayak (IOFS:1986) Ashish Gupta (IPS:1989:UP) Sadanand Vasant Date (IPS:1990:MH) Ms. Rashmi Chowdhary … Web25 apr 2024 · The Appointments Committee of the Cabinet, on Friday, has approved empanelment of the 14 officers from IA&AS, IDAS, IPS, IRPS, IRS, IOFS for holding …
Web17 mar 2024 · La State Trading Corporation of India Ltd. a annoncé la nomination de Mme Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser, Ministry of Commerce & Industry, en tant qu'administratrice ... Web27 apr 2024 · Ms Arti Bhatnagar IDAS (1990) has been empanelled for holding Additional Secretary level post at the Centre by the Appointments Committee of the Cabinet . … [ …
Web15 feb 2024 · Bharat Heavy Electricals Limited hat bekannt gegeben, dass Frau Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser , Ministry of Commerce & Industry , mit Wirkung zum 14. Februar 2024... 16 Februar 2024 Web15 feb 2024 · HMT Limited announced that Ms. Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser , Ministry of Heavy Industries , has been appointed as Government …
Web20 mar 2024 · Additional PS to Minister of State (HI) Room No. 36-A, Udyog Bhawan, New Delhi: ... Ms. Arti Bhatnagar, IDAS. AS&FA. 121, Udyog Bhawan, New Delhi. ... arti[dot]bhatnagar[at]nic[dot]in. Dr. Hanif Qureshi, IPS. Joint Secretary . Room No.126-C, Udyog Bhawan,Rafi Marg, New Delhi-110011. 23062365 . 23062367 . …
Web15 feb 2024 · Bharat Heavy Electricals (BHEL) announced the appointment of Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser (AS & FA), Ministry of Commerce & Industry (M/o C&I) as Part-time Official Director on the Board of BHEL w.e.f. 14 February 2024 in place of Shashank Priya, who ceased to be Director on the BHEL's Board w.e.f. … infinitylearn. com/scoreWeb9 mag 2024 · Program Director. May 2024 - Mar 20241 year 11 months. San Francisco Bay Area. • Led EducationSuperHighway’s Programs … infinitylearn.comWeb15 feb 2024 · New Delhi: Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary and Financial Adviser (AS & FA), Ministry of Commerce and Industry (M/o C&I) has been appointed as Part-time Official Director on the Board of BHEL with effect from February 14 in place of Shashank Priya, who ceased to be Director on the BHEL’s Board with effect from February 14, said … infinity learning center las vegasWeb30 mar 2024 · Bharat Heavy Electricals Limited announced that pursuant to communication from Ministry of Heavy Industries and approval of the Board of BHEL, Ms. Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser (AS & FA), Ministry of Commerce & Industry (M/o C&I) has been appointed as Part-time Official Director on the Board of BHEL effective … infinity law supportWeb13 mag 2024 · National carrier Air India's anti-corruption officer Arti Bhatnagar and national intelligence grid (NATGRID) chief Ashish Gupta have been promoted to additional … infinity learn fundingWebDesign Researcher at DHIS2, previously Obvious. A post-grad from the Young India Fellowship at Ashoka University, I am a problem solver and a designer of User … infinity leap trampolineWeb15 feb 2024 · Ms. Arti Bhatnagar has been inducted as Part Time Official Director on the Board of BHEL w.e.f 14.02.2024. She is a Civil Servant of the Indian Defence Accounts … infinity learn score test